Kilgore, Gregory v. Noel et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80471 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 State Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
6
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Wed 04/17 7:27 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER THE PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT (PLRA)/ Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Motions terminated:3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory Kilgore. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (drz) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 11:57 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory Kilgore. (kma) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Tue 04/16 11:56 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks (kma) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens
Tue 04/16 11:27 AM
Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Drew Noel, Anthony O'Dea. Filing fee $ 405.00 (IFP Motion filed), filed by Gregory Kilgore.(kma) |