DIEGELMANN et al v. YELLIN et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | James E Boasberg |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01090 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
|
|
Defendant
OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL
|
|
Defendant
BRADLEY SMITH
|
|
Defendant
JANET YELLIN
|
|
Plaintiff
AXEL DIEGELMANN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRITZ DIEGELMANN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LIEMETA AG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RHEINGOLD EDELMETALL AG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RHEINGOLD EDELMETALL GMBH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/23 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen McCoy Elliott on behalf of BRADLEY SMITH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, JANET YELLIN (Elliott, Stephen) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Fri 04/19 8:30 AM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/19 8:26 AM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (znmw) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 1:53 PM
COMPLAINT (Corrected Signature) against All Plaintiffs (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by RHEINGOLD EDELMETALL AG, FRITZ DIEGELMANN, AXEL DIEGELMANN, RHEINGOLD EDELMETALL GMBH, LIEMETA AG.(Toossi, Amir) |
|
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Thu 04/18 8:01 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Invalid signature on complaint. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or /s/ Attorney Name to represent an electronic signature of the filer. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)
Wed 04/17 3:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET (corrected) by RHEINGOLD EDELMETALL AG, FRITZ DIEGELMANN, AXEL DIEGELMANN, RHEINGOLD EDELMETALL GMBH, LIEMETA AG filed by RHEINGOLD EDELMETALL AG, FRITZ DIEGELMANN, AXEL DIEGELMANN, RHEINGOLD EDELMETALL GMBH, LIEMETA AG.(Toossi, Amir) |
|
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Wed 04/17 9:16 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect civil cover sheet. Please file the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet. Invalid/No signature on both complaint and cover sheet. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or /s/ Attorney Name to represent an electronic signature of the filer. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 9:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10832434) filed by RHEINGOLD EDELMETALL AG, FRITZ DIEGELMANN, AXEL DIEGELMANN, RHEINGOLD EDELMETALL GMBH, LIEMETA AG.(Toossi, Amir) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons |