Veal v. Forsyth County Detention Center et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steve C Jones |
Referred: | J Clay Fuller |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00073 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
7
pgs
order
Order ruling on IFP
Thu 05/02 2:38 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis2 and ordering Plaintiff, within 30 days, to either (1) pay the $405.00 filing and administrative fees, or (2) submit a complete IFP application with all required information, certifications, signatures and attachments. Plaintiff is further ordered to submit an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. Service of process shall not issue pending consideration of Plaintiff's amended complaint under 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 05/02/2024. (ddm) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Thu 05/02 2:39 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Samuel David Veal re3 Order, IFP form and 1983 Complaint. (ddm) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/16 10:35 AM
Submission of1 Complaint,2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (rsg) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 10:35 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel David Veal. (rsg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Samuel David Veal.(rsg) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |