Duncan v. Commonwoalta Attorneys
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Greg N Stivers |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00235 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Commonwoalta Attorneys
|
|
Plaintiff
Tyrone Duncan
835 S. 7th Street
Louisville, KY 40203 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 05/02 3:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tyrone Duncan. (DeW) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Deficiency
Tue 04/16 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency re1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: No Filing Fee or Application to Proceed Without Payment. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/16/2024. (KDY) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Tue 04/16 2:52 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (KDY) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Tyrone Duncan against Commonwoalta Attorneys. No fee paid. (KDY) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Tendered |