Martin v. Call et al
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Simpson, III |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00237 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Petitioner
Donald Lynn Martin
|
|
Respondent
Federal Bureau of Prisons
|
|
Respondent
Matt Call
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Return of Service
Thu 05/02 9:49 AM
Certified Mail Return Receipt re DN3 /4 as to Respondent Matt Call. (HMC) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 04/19 12:27 PM
ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 04/18/2024. IT IS ORDERED that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 is DENIED and that the action is DISMISSED. There being no just reason for delay in its entry, this is a final and appealable Order. The Court certifies that an appeal in forma pauperis would be frivolous and therefore not taken in good faith. cc: Petitioner (pro se), Respondent, US Attorney (HMC) |
|
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Fri 04/19 12:22 PM
MEMORANDUM by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 04/18/2024. Because the petition indicates that Martin is currently incarcerated at RRM Detroit, the proper venue for this action is the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, where Martin's custodian is located. Martin is not entitled to relief under §2241, and the Court will not transfer the petition. The Court will enter a separate Order consistent with this Memorandum.cc: Petitioner (pro se), Respondent, US Attorney (HMC) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Tue 04/16 1:02 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (HMC) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 04/16 12:59 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Donald Lynn Martin. (HMC) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Indictment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - DOC. 24-4, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Prosecutor's Statements, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Code Word, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Letter to David Mejia re: "Fun", | ||
Att: 6 Exhibits F, G, and H - Intentionally Left Blank, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit I - Trial Transcripts, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit J - Emails and Texts | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 04/16 1:10 PM
Filing fee: $ 5.00 receipt number 300007667 re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Donald Lynn Martin. (TNT) |