Odom v. Weese et al
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph H Mckinley, Jr |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00065 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
utility
Schedules
Wed 05/01 3:25 PM
Schedules Initial Review due by 9/3/2024. (EAS) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/29 3:43 PM
ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 4/29/24; granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: cc: Plaintiff(pro se), Finance, KSP (DJT) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Tue 04/16 12:08 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (EAS) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 04/16 12:11 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Glenn D. Odom by Glenn D. Odom. (EAS) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 12:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Glenn D. Odom (EAS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 12:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Cookie Crews, John Gibbs, Austin Weese, Jimmy Wilson, filed by Glenn D. Odom. (EAS) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law and Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |