In Re Raymond C. Green
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Julia E Kobick |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10994 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 11:101 Bankruptcy |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Appellant
Nicholas Fiorillo
3 Kales Way
Harwich Port, MA 02646 |
|
In Re
Raymond C Green
|
|
Trustee
Richard King
Office of the US Trustee 5 Post Office Square 10th Fl Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 04/16 3:36 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Julia E. Kobick assigned to case. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 04/16 3:23 PM
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Local Rule 40.1, I direct the Clerk to return this case for random reassignment to a new district judge. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 04/16 2:18 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
appeal
Bankruptcy Docket Received
Tue 04/16 2:06 PM
Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received:1 Bankruptcy Appeal (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Tue 04/16 2:06 PM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 23-10728 File received(McManus, Caetlin) |
|
Att: 1 Initial Transmittal |