Lardizabal et al v. The Vanguard Group, Inc. et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Baylson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01577 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal--Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | California Southern, 3:24-cv-00172 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 8:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
DOES 1 THROUGH 100
|
|
Defendant
THE VANGUARD GROUP INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aidan Lardizabal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mayra Alejandra Puentes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Tue 04/30 8:32 AM
PAPER #36 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 4:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MAY SERVE RULE 34 REQUESTS, LIMITED TO THE SUBJECT MATTER OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS WITHIN 10 DAYS. DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO SUPPORT THEIR ARGUMENT THAT THE DISCOVERY IS NOT RELEVANT FOR THE COURT TO DECIDE THE 12 (b)(6) MOTION, WITHIN TEN DAYS; AND PLAINTFFS MAY FILE A BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER WITHIN 10 DAYS; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/29/24. 4/29/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL) |
|
35 | 35
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Interim
Mon 04/29 3:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON RULE 16 Conference held on 4/29/24. (JL) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 04/24 3:25 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF BLAKE STEINBERG TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/24/24.4/24/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED. (JL) |
|
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/24 3:24 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF AMY TU QUYEN LE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/24/24.4/24/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED. (JL) |
|
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 04/24 3:22 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID R. SINGH TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/24/24.4/24/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(JL) |
|
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 04/24 3:21 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID L. YOHAI TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/24/24.4/24/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(JL) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Burton on behalf of THE VANGUARD GROUP INC. with Certificate of Service(Burton, Abigail) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 04/24 1:38 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Blake Steinberg ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17420864.) filed by THE VANGUARD GROUP INC..Certificate of Service.(SILVER, SAMUEL) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
28 | 28
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 04/24 1:36 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Amy Tu Quyen Le ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17420840.) filed by THE VANGUARD GROUP INC..Certificate of Service.(SILVER, SAMUEL) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
27 | 27
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 04/24 1:33 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of David R. Singh ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17420825.) filed by THE VANGUARD GROUP INC..Certificate of Service.(SILVER, SAMUEL) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 04/24 1:30 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of David L. Yohai ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17420817.) filed by THE VANGUARD GROUP INC..Certificate of Service.(SILVER, SAMUEL) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL W. SILVER on behalf of THE VANGUARD GROUP INC. with Certificate of Service(SILVER, SAMUEL) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 04/17 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/29/2024 03:00 PM (EASTERN TIME) BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS WILL INITIATE THIS TELECONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, JOIN CHAMBERS ON TO THE CALL (PH: 267-299-7520).(lds) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 04/16 3:18 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:24-cv-00172. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
22 | 22 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Pensylvania. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Eastern District of Pensylvania*.*601 Market Street**Philadelphia, PA 19106*. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/15/2024. (anh) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Transfer Order | ||
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
21 | 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Vanguard Group, Inc.. (Singh, David) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
20 | 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 filed by The Vanguard Group, Inc..(Singh, David) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Evan Stanley | ||
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion for Extension of time [Doc. No.18 ].. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/12/2024. (anh) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
18 | 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Replies to Plaintiffs' Oppositions to the Motion to Dismiss and the Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by The Vanguard Group, Inc..(Singh, David) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of David R. Singh, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
17 | 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Request Oral Argument by Aidan Lardizabal, Mayra Alejandra Puentes. (Rodriguez, Christopher) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
16 | 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 filed by Aidan Lardizabal, Mayra Alejandra Puentes.(Rodriguez, Christopher) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D | ||
15 | 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Request Oral Argument by Aidan Lardizabal, Mayra Alejandra Puentes. (Rodriguez, Christopher) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
14 | 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aidan Lardizabal, Mayra Alejandra Puentes.(Rodriguez, Christopher) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E | ||
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Vanguard Group, Inc.. (Singh, David) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
12 | 12 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 by The Vanguard Group, Inc..(Singh, David) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Evan Stanley, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - E | ||
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. No.9 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/29/2024. (anh) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of David Yohai . Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/26/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
9 | 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Vanguard Group, Inc.. (Singh, David) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
8 | 8 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Blake J. Steinberg . Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/26/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
7 | 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $224.00 receipt number ACASDC-18535894.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Steinberg, Blake)(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
6 | 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $224.00 receipt number ACASDC-18535812.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Yohai, David)(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
5 | 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24-cv-0172-CAB-DEB.(no document attached) (dim) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Vanguard Group, Inc. re2 Notice of Party With Financial Interest,3 Corporate Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Singh, David) (dim). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Vanguard Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group of Investment Companies for The Vanguard Group, Inc... (Singh, David) (dim). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by The Vanguard Group, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group of Investment Companies, Other Affiliate Aidan Lardizabal, Other Affiliate Mayra Alejandra Puentes for The Vanguard Group, Inc.. (Singh, David) (dim). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18530686.), filed by The Vanguard Group, Inc.. The new case number is 3:24-cv-172-BTM-DEB. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(stn) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B |