Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Colleen R Lawless
Referred: Karen L Mcnaught
Case #: 3:24-mc-03005
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Terminated:Aug 30, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
15 15 misc Response (NOT to a motion/petition) Tue 04/15 7:04 PM
Response by First National Property Management L.L.C re Motion Hearing, . (Bareentto, Omar)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Response (NOT to a motion/petition) Tue 04/15 6:54 PM
Response by First National Property Management L.L.C re Motion Hearing, .(Bareentto, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 04/09 4:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen R. Lawless: MOTION HEARING held on 4/9/2025. Attorney Omar Bareentto present on behalf of the Plaintiff. No appearance on behalf of the Defendant. Argument heard regarding Motion for Sanctions (doc.12 ). Plaintiff to file a proposed order with 7 days. Hearing adjourned. (Court Reporter SP-1 3:13.) (JPL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
13 13 misc Response (NOT to a motion/petition) Tue 04/01 2:20 PM
Response by First National Property Management L.L.C re Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, .(Bareentto, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Thursday, March 13, 2025
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 03/13 11:38 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colleen R. Lawless on 3/13/2025: Before this Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Civil Contempt Sanctions12 . A hearing on the merits of the Motion12 is scheduled for 4/9/2025 at 3:00 p.m. in person in Courtroom I. At that hearing, Respondent should be prepared to discuss why he should not be held in contempt under Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 45(g). (RES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
order Order Removing Referral Judge Thu 02/27 8:52 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 02/27/2025. Due to Judge Karen McNaught's retirement, this case is no longer referred to Judge Karen McNaught. (DW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
12 12 motion Sanctions Wed 02/26 7:18 PM
MOTION for Sanctions by Petitioner First National Property Management L.L.C. Responses due by 3/12/2025(Bareentto, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Supplement Certification of Omar A. Bareentto,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Supplement Certification of Service
Friday, August 30, 2024
order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 08/30 11:25 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 8/30/2024. On 8/22/2024, plaintiff was directed to file a statement indicating whether this case should remain open, and if so, indicate the issues still unresolved. The deadline to file the statement was 8/29/2024. No statement was filed. Therefore, this case is closed. (RES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 08/22 2:06 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 8/22/2024. Petitioner First National Property Management LLC commenced this case to enforce a subpoena. The motion was granted, and respondent was ordered to comply on or before July 16, 2024. The docket does not reflect any further activity since June 25, 2024. There do not appear to be any remaining issues for the court to adjudicate. Petitioner shall file a statement indicating whether the case should remain open at this time and, if so, indicate the issues still unresolved. If petitioner does not file a statement within seven (7) days of the date of this order, the court will close the case. (RES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 06/25 3:23 PM
ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 6/25/2024. Petitioner's motion1 is granted in part and denied in part. Respondent is ordered to comply with the subpoena on or before July 16, 2024. The motion is denied as to an award of fees and costs. See full written Order.(RES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/22 10:32 AM
NOTICE(Hindy, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 05/21 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Omar Bareentto on behalf of First National Property Management L.L.C (Bareentto, Omar)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 05/21 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Gregory J. Hindy on behalf of First National Property Management L.L.C (Hindy, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Mon 05/06 10:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by First National Property Management L.L.C. (Hansen, Jim)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 04/17 4:53 PM
Summons Issued as to James May. Original mailed to attorney. (MJC)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc 7.1 Disclosure Statement Wed 04/17 2:49 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by First National Property Management L.L.C. (Hansen, Jim)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Designation of Lead Counsel Wed 04/17 2:47 PM
Designation of Lead Counsel by Jim Hansen on behalf of First National Property Management L.L.C. (Hansen, Jim)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
3 3 misc Exhibit Wed 04/17 8:55 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by First National Property Management L.L.C. (MJC)
Related: [-]
2 2 13 pgs misc Memorandum Tue 04/16 5:42 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by First National Property Management L.L.C.(MJC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1-3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1-4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1-5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 1-6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 1-7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 1-8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 1-9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 1-10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 1-11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 1-12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 1-13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 1-14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 1-15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 1-16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 1-17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 1-18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 1-19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 1-20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 1-21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 1-22,
Att: 23 Exhibit 1-23,
Att: 24 Exhibit 1-24,
Att: 25 Exhibit 1-25,
Att: 26 Exhibit 1-26,
Att: 27 Exhibit 1-27,
Att: 28 Exhibit 1-28,
Att: 29 Exhibit 1-29,
Att: 30 Exhibit 1-30,
Att: 31 Exhibit 1-31,
Att: 32 Exhibit 1-32,
Att: 33 Exhibit 1-33,
Att: 34 Exhibit 1-34,
Att: 35 Exhibit 1-35,
Att: 36 Exhibit 1-36,
Att: 37 Exhibit 1-37,
Att: 38 Exhibit 1-38,
Att: 39 Exhibit 1-39,
Att: 40 Exhibit 1-40,
Att: 41 Exhibit 1-41,
Att: 42 Exhibit 1-42,
Att: 43 Exhibit 2
1 1 motion Compel Tue 04/16 5:15 PM
MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Against Respondent James May by Petitioner First National Property Management L.L.C. Responses due by 4/30/2024. (MJC)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 04/16 5:50 PM
Filing fee: $ 52.00, receipt number 300001250. (MJC)
Related: [-]