Byrd v. Raimondo
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy B Vitter |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00941 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 4:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
Gina Raimondo
|
|
Plaintiff
Chelsey L. Byrd
1101 S. Upland Avenue
Metairie, LA 70003 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/30 2:26 PM
Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney, Louisiana Eastern District. (Sent to Plaintiff via USPS w/ Pauper Order, Pauper Letter, and Complaint)(cs) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Mon 04/22 2:04 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Appointment of an Attorney is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 4/22/2024. (cs) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 3:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Gina Raimondo. (Sent to Plaintiff via USPS w/ Pauper Order, Pauper Letter, and Complaint) (cs) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 3:30 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 4/16/2024. (cs) |
|
Att: 1 Pauper Letter | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 04/16 9:46 AM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Chelsey L. Byrd. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (ss) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 9:45 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Chelsey L. Byrd. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (ss) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 9:33 AM
COMPLAINT against Gina Raimondo filed by Chelsey L. Byrd.(ss) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |