Moody v. Falkenrath et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Brian C Wimes |
Referred: | Prisoner Pro Se |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04057 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 04/29 10:18 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to pay the initial partial filing fee (Doc.5 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis and shall pay the initial partial filing of $1.71 on or before MAY 16, 2024.Signed on 4/29/2024 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/29 10:15 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to correct technical defect (Doc.6 ) is DENIED as the name of the defendant identified in the complaint is correctly spelled.Signed on 4/29/2024 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
motion
Order
Thu 04/25 3:14 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for order to direct clerk to correct technical defects filed by Michael Allen Moody. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 04/25 3:12 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for extension of time to pay initial partial filing fee filed by Michael Allen Moody. (Attachment: #1 Inmate Account Statement)(Willis, Kathy) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
order
Order
Wed 04/24 5:19 PM
ORDER: The document received from Plaintiff on APRIL 24, 2024, is illegible. Plaintiff is directed to ensure that the handwriting or text is dark enough to be properly scanned and resubmit the document on or before APRIL 29, 2024. Signed on 4/24/2024 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/16 3:48 PM
ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, an initial partial filing fee of $1.71; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before APRIL 30, 2024, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on 4/16/2024 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Inmate Account Statement
Tue 04/16 3:40 PM
INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Michael Allen Moody. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Financial Affidavit
Tue 04/16 11:10 AM
IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Michael Allen Moody. (Willis, Kathy) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Michael Allen Moody. (#1 Attachments, #2 Exhibits)(Willis, Kathy) |