Kuehner v. Marion
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Bataillon |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00133 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 3:06 AM CDT |
Defendant
Shaina N. Marion
|
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth W Kuehner
#619 353 N 44th St.
Lincoln, NE 68503 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment - Pro Se
Wed 04/24 11:48 AM
JUDGMENT - PRO SE - This matter is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons discussed in the Memorandum and Order entered on this date. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JES) |
|
Att: 1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/24 11:42 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Complaint, Filing No.1 , is dismissed without prejudice because it is frivolous and fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Filing No.2 , is denied. The Court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JES) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
oth_evt
Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)
Tue 04/16 3:03 PM
NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (JES) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order - Pro Se GO 2022-04
Tue 04/16 3:16 PM
GENERAL ORDER NO. 2022-04: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JES) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 2:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth W Kuehner. (JES) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Pro Se
Tue 04/16 2:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Shaina N. Marion filed on behalf of Kenneth W Kuehner. (JES) |