Walker (PS) v. Lankford et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01006 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 05/01 12:16 PM
Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Arthur Walker. (norlin, ) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 05/01 12:15 PM
AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Beeler, Bradshaw, Lankford, filed by Arthur Walker.(norlin, ) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
10
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/18 3:20 PM
ORDER TO FILE AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT Plaintiff shall file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with all directives contained in this order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed in whole or in part without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/18/2024. (norlin, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 4:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1915. ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (ECF No.2 ) is granted , by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/16/2024.(ccuen, ) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/16 9:24 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 9:23 AM
Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Arthur Walker. (efoga, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 9:22 AM
PRISONER COMPLAINT against Beeler, Bradshaw, Lankford, filed by Arthur Walker.(efoga, ) |