Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-01585
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 2:35 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Duty AUSA-El Paso
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jaen Carlos Nieves Camejo (1)
Terminated: 04/15/2024
Represented By
Ray Velarde
Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 3:24 AM CDT
Monday, April 15, 2024
Complaint Count added: Jaen Carlos Nieves Camejo (1) (mg2)
Related: [-]
Oral Motion to Remit Special Assessment Fee by USA as to Jaen Carlos Nieves Camejo. (epda)
Related: [-]
Oral Order GRANTING [] Motion to Remit Special Assessment Fee as to Jaen Carlos Nieves Camejo (1). Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (epda)
Related: [-]
1 1 Petty Documents as to Jaen Carlos Nieves Camejo (epda)
Related: [-]