Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-02723
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
David Eligoola (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Noticing AUSA CR TP/SR
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/03/2024 3:13 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
1 1 6 pgs Magistrate Judge Removal of Complaint from Southern District of New York Case number in the other District 24-MAG-1492 as to David Eligoola (1). (kan)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs ORDER TO UNSEAL as to David Eligoola Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (ogn1)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel by David Eligoola (Houlihan, Raymond)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 40 Proceedings as to David Eligoola held on 4/16/2024. Bond set: David Eligoola (1) $100,000 10% WITH NEBBIA & $250,000 PSB. Date of Arrest or Surrender: 4/16/2024. Defendant Waived the Removal/Identity Hearing. The Court Orders the Defendant removed to the Southern District of New York for all further proceedings. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-MIA for David Eligoola (Digital JG-13:31:15;13:49:24) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/16/2024). (at)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs WAIVER OF RULE 5 & 5.1 REMOVAL/IDENTITY HEARINGS by David Eligoola (at)
Related: [-]