New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer L Rochon |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02888 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1151 Immigration and Nationality Act of 1952 |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 8:06 AM EDT |
ADR Provider
Flera Muzaeva
352 E. 119th St. Apt 3-C
New York, NY 10035 |
|
ADR Provider
Fedor Strelkov
352 East 119th St. Apt 3-C
New York, NY 10035 |
|
ADR Provider
Stanislav Strelkov
352 East 119th St Apt 3-C
New York, NY 10035 |
|
ADR Provider
Zhanna Strelkova
352 East 119th St. Apt 3-C
New York, NY 10035 |
Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Fri 04/19 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/27/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 4/19/2024) (jca) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 04/18 9:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Julian Henry Lowenfeld. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Michael Borgen, Patrick Lechleitner, Wen-Ting Chen,Zhanna Strelkova, Stanislav Strelkov, Fedor Strelkov, Flera Muzaeva. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/18 10:01 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/18 10:02 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/18 10:02 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus
Wed 04/17 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Michael Borgen, Patrick Lechleitner, Wen-Ting Chen (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29231075).Document filed by Zhanna Strelkova, Stanislav Strelkov, Fedor Strelkov, Flera Muzaeva..(Lowenfeld, Julian) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading
Wed 04/17 10:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Julian Henry Lowenfeld to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 4/22/2024. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/17 10:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Julian Henry Lowenfeld. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) |