Herrera v. Christofle Silver Inc
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kathleen M Williams |
Referred: | Jonathan Goodman |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21429 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 11:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Christofle Silver Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Oscar Herrera
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Fri 04/19 5:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re4 Order,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, (Verified Certificate of Prior ADA Filings) by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Oscar Herrera (Hannah, Roderick) |
|
6 | 6
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Fri 04/19 9:37 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (fbn) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 3:03 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Oscar Herrera. Christofle Silver Inc served on 4/18/2024, response/answer due 5/9/2024. (Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Wed 04/17 2:08 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and Notice of Court Practice In ADA Cases. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 11:33 AM
Summons Issued as to Christofle Silver Inc. (kpe) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/17 11:31 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT against Christofle Silver Inc. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17454578, filed by Oscar Herrera.(Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) |