Moore v. Coleman et al
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James C Dever, III |
Referred: | Kimberly A Swank |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00061 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 11:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Walter Alexander Coleman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Logistics Solutions Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberley Moore
Henson & Fuerst, P.A. 3110 Edwards Mill Rd Suite 100
Raleigh, NC 27612 |
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 10:54 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Kimberley Moore (Henson, Carmaletta) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
discov
Order for Discovery Plan
Thu 04/25 3:39 PM
ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/25/2024. (Mann, Stephanie) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 1:20 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Carmaletta L. Henson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Henson, Carmaletta) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Thu 04/25 12:00 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Walter Alexander Coleman, Logistics Solutions Group, LLC. (Phillips, Anderson) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice-other
Fri 04/19 8:20 AM
Notice regarding1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Carmaletta L. Henson of Henson Fuerst, PA at 3110 Edwards Mill Rd., Suite 100, Raleigh, NC 27612 mailed via US Mail on April 19, 2024. (Rudd, D.) |
|
notice
Notice to Counsel
Fri 04/19 8:10 AM
Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure
Fri 04/19 8:11 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Walter Alexander Coleman, Logistics Solutions Group, LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) |
||
notice
Notice to Counsel
Fri 04/19 8:13 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-3] Civil Cover Sheet, [1-4] Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" ( the civil cover sheet, the supplemental removal cover sheet ) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 10:41 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Anderson Herman Phillips on behalf of All Defendants. (Phillips, Anderson) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 10:38 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Edgecombe County, Superior Court, case number 24 CVS 100. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7570045), filed by All Defendants. (Phillips, Anderson) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet |