Watkins v. Biden et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael H Watson |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01809 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 11:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Joe Biden
|
|
Defendant
Donald Trump
|
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Watkins
P.O. Box 298215
Columbus, OH 43229 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/22 12:13 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Patricia Watkins against Joe Biden & Donald Trump. (er) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 04/18 12:52 PM
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1-1) be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 5/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/18/2024. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 12:59 PM
This entry is for statistical purposes only. Please see ECF No.2 for the document. (er) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 10:14 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Patricia Watkins. (mas) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 USM Forms |