TEASLEY v. GREEN MTN. CONCERT SERVICES, INC. et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Cynthia M Rufe |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01588 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, 231200224 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 11:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
GREEN MTN. CONCERT SERVICES, INC.
25 Wentworth Drive
Williston, VT 05495 |
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES (1 10)
|
|
Defendant
RED HAWK PROTECTION SOLUTIONS, LLC
325-41 Chestnut St.
Philadelphia, PA 19106 |
|
Defendant
XYX CORPS (1 10)
|
|
Plaintiff
ERIC TEASLEY
341 N. Connecticut Avenue
Atlantic City, NJ 08401 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Wed 04/24 2:25 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO REMAND THIS CASE FORTHWITH TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, WHERE IT WAS FILED AT CASE NO. 231200224, AND TO CLOSE THE CASE IN THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA.SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/24/24.4/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (amas) |
|
Att: 1 (4/24/2024) CERTIFIED REMAND ORDER | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 04/24 1:26 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION to Remand of Case to the CCP of Philadelphia County, PA filed by GREEN MTN. CONCERT SERVICES, INC.. (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
respm
Memorandum
Tue 04/23 4:44 PM
Memorandum in Support of Motion for Remand re8 MOTION to Remand of Case to the CCP of Philadelphia County, PA filed by ERIC TEASLEY. (SILVERMAN, HOWARD) |
|
13 | 13
discov
Disclosure of Citizenship
Tue 04/23 2:42 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by RED HAWK PROTECTION SOLUTIONS, LLC . (Feenane, J.D.) |
|
12 | 12
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Tue 04/23 2:40 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RED HAWK PROTECTION SOLUTIONS, LLC.(Feenane, J.D.) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 04/23 8:24 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT GREEN MTN. CONCERT SERVICES, INC.S (GREEN MTN.) MOTION TO FILE AN OVERLENGTH BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE [DOC. NO. 7], IS DENIED. DEFENDANT GREEN MTN.S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION SHALL NOT EXCEED FIFTEEN (15) PAGES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/22/24.4/23/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
10 | 10
discov
Disclosure
Mon 04/22 3:56 PM
Disclosure by ERIC TEASLEY.(SILVERMAN, HOWARD) |
|
9 | 9
misc
State Court Record - Attachment
Mon 04/22 1:24 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, ) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Remand
Mon 04/22 10:26 AM
MOTION to Remand of Case to the CCP of Philadelphia County, PA filed by ERIC TEASLEY.Plaintiff's Motion for Remand of Case to CCP Phioladelphia County.(SILVERMAN, HOWARD) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 04/19 3:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Overlength brief filed by GREEN MTN. CONCERT SERVICES, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service, Memo.(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by J.D. Feenane on behalf of RED HAWK PROTECTION SOLUTIONS, LLC with Certificate of Service(Feenane, J.D.) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/18 9:35 AM
ORDER THAT, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(A)(2), PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS SHALL EACH FILE A DISCLOSURE OF CITIZENSHIP IN DIVERSITY JURISDICTION CASES (FORM ATTACHED) NO LATER THAN TUESDAY, APRIL 23, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ANY PARTY WHICH IS A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, PARTNERSHIP, OR UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION SHALL SPECIFICALLY IDENTIFY THE CITIZENSHIP OF ALL OF ITS RESPECTIVE MEMBERS OR PARTNERS. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/17/24. 4/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/17 2:30 PM
NOTICE by GREEN MTN. CONCERT SERVICES, INC. re1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Disclosure of Citizenship
Wed 04/17 2:27 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by GREEN MTN. CONCERT SERVICES, INC. re1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), .(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Designation Form | ||
2 | 2
adr
Letter re: Arbitration Certification
Wed 04/17 1:37 PM
Letter re: Arbitration Certification(sbt) |
|
Att: 1 Arbitration Certification Form | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Attorney)
Wed 04/17 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GREEN MTN. CONCERT SERVICES, INC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17404638), filed by GREEN MTN. CONCERT SERVICES, INC..(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/17/2024) (sbt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service COS | ||
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Wed 04/17 1:36 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is missing. (sbt) |