HALLE v. PARKER et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Kezia OL Taylor |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00581 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/19 2:34 PM
ORDER denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case administratively CLOSED. Petitioner may reopen this case by paying the $5.00 filing fee within 20 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on April 19, 2024. (kcb) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 11:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WILLIAM HALLE. (cel) |
|
Att: 1 Habeas Petition lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Wed 04/17 2:17 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by WILLIAM HALLE. (njd) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 04/18 11:25 AM
Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor added. (cel) |