Allstate Insurance Company et al v Mini Invasive Orthopedics, LLC et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sean F Cox |
Referred: | Curtis Ivy, Jr |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11008 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 12:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
All Michigan Orthopedics PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mini Invasive Orthopedics LLC
|
|
Defendant
Oppenheimer Spine & Pain Clinic PLC
|
|
Defendant
Osman Spine Clinic PLLC
|
|
Defendant
Power Physical Therapy PLLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allstate Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
order
Vacating Show Cause*
Wed 05/01 10:25 AM
Order Vacating17 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/26 12:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Osman Spine Clinic PLLC served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024. (DeNinno, Andrew) |
|
19 | 19
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/26 12:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Oppenheimer Spine & Pain Clinic PLC served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024. (DeNinno, Andrew) |
|
18 | 18
respoth
Response to Order to Show Cause
Fri 04/26 11:48 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE at ECF No. 17 by All Plaintiffs. (DeNinno, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Company Profile Report from the Illinois Department of Insurance identifying Allstate Insurance Company as a P&C Domestic Stock company domiciled in Cook County, Illinois with its corporate address in Northbrook, Illinois, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Insurance Company Detail from the State of Michigan Department of Insurance and Financial Services identifying Allstate Insurance Company as an entity with stockholder ownership that is domiciled in the State of Illinois, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Company Profile Report from the Illinois Department of Insurance identifying Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as a P&C Domestic Stock company domiciled in Cook County, Illinois with its corporate address in Northbrook, Illinois, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Insurance Company Detail from the State of Michigan Department of Insurance and Financial Services identifying Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as an entity with stockholder ownership that is domiciled in the State of Illinois, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Company Profile Report from the Illinois Department of Insurance identifying Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company as a P&C Domestic Stock company domiciled in Cook County, Illinois with its corporate address in Northbrook, Illinois, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Insurance Company Detail from the State of Michigan Department of Insurance and Financial Services identifying Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company as an entity with stockholder ownership that is domiciled in the State of Illinois, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Allstate Representative Confirming That All Plaintiffs Are Illinois Corporations | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Show Cause
Thu 04/25 2:38 PM
ORDER for Plaintiffs to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 5/9/2024 Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/22 4:16 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary R. Blumberg appearing on behalf of All Michigan Orthopedics PLC, Mini Invasive Orthopedics LLC, Power Physical Therapy PLLC (Blumberg, Gary) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Mon 04/22 3:52 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Power Physical Therapy PLLC (Joelson, Peter) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Mon 04/22 3:51 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Mini Invasive Orthopedics LLC (Joelson, Peter) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Mon 04/22 3:49 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Michigan Orthopedics PLC (Joelson, Peter) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/22 3:07 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Emily R. Warren appearing on behalf of All Michigan Orthopedics PLC, Mini Invasive Orthopedics LLC, Power Physical Therapy PLLC (Warren, Emily) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/22 2:49 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter W. Joelson appearing on behalf of All Michigan Orthopedics PLC, Mini Invasive Orthopedics LLC, Power Physical Therapy PLLC (Joelson, Peter) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Mon 04/22 1:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Power Physical Therapy PLLC waiver sent on 4/22/2024, answer due 6/21/2024. (DeNinno, Andrew) |
|
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Mon 04/22 1:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Mini Invasive Orthopedics LLC waiver sent on 4/22/2024, answer due 6/21/2024. (DeNinno, Andrew) |
|
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Mon 04/22 1:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Michigan Orthopedics PLC waiver sent on 4/22/2024, answer due 6/21/2024. (DeNinno, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued*
Thu 04/18 11:55 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *All Michigan Orthopedics PLC, Mini Invasive Orthopedics LLC, Oppenheimer Spine & Pain Clinic PLC, Osman Spine Clinic PLLC, Power Physical Therapy PLLC * (MSyl) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Wed 04/17 11:37 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (DeNinno, Andrew) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Wed 04/17 11:35 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (DeNinno, Andrew) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Wed 04/17 11:34 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company. (DeNinno, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Appearance
Wed 04/17 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Compston on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Compston, Brad) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Wed 04/17 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Tilden on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Tilden, Nathan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Wed 04/17 11:16 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company against Mini Invasive Orthopedics LLC, All Michigan Orthopedics PLC, Oppenheimer Spine & Pain Clinic PLC, Osman Spine Clinic PLLC, Power Physical Therapy PLLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9754846 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (DeNinno, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement Breached by the Defendants, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Combined Summonses |