Benson v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Kathryn A Starnella |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01025 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Denver County District Court, 2024CV30815 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 11:09 AM MDT |
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aimee Benson
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Fri 05/03 11:44 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 3 May 2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/3/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2024 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (cmadr, ) |
|
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document, | ||
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document | ||
10 | 10
order
Minute Order
Fri 05/03 11:02 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#8] is May 28, 2024. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 5/3/2024. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/24 5:32 PM
ANSWER to4 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Brooks, Lawrence) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Wed 04/17 3:20 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, ) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 04/17 3:20 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
6 | 6
4
pgs
misc
Order - State Court
Wed 04/17 3:19 PM
STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint Until April 22,2024. By Mark T Bailey, District Court Judge, Denver County on 4/11/2024. (efoga, ) |
|
5 | 5
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Wed 04/17 3:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Cover Sheet, and Complaint upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 3/18/2024 (efoga, ) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Aimee Benson.(efoga, ) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Wed 04/17 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer Torres on behalf of Aimee BensonAttorney Jennifer Torres added to party Aimee Benson(pty:pla) (Torres, Jennifer) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/17 10:38 AM
NOTICE re1 Notice of Removal,,,, Civil Case Cover Sheet by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(Brooks, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 10:15 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2024CV30815. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9641468), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Brooks, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal - Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal - Civil Case Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Removal - Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Notice of Removal - Voter Registration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Notice of Removal - Declaration Page, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Notice of Removal - Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Notice of Removal - SF Articles of Incorporation, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I to Notice of Removal - SF Corporate Disclosure Statement, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit J to Notice of Removal - Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit K to Notice of Removal - Motion for Extension to Respond to Complaint, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit L to Notice of Removal - Order Granting State Farm's Motion for Extension to Respond to Complaint |