Fernandez v. Chico's Fas, Inc
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Aileen M Cannon |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80477 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Chico's Fas, Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Nelson Fernandez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 4:56 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nelson Fernandez. Chico's Fas, Inc served on 4/23/2024, response/answer due 5/14/2024. (Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 1:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Chico's Fas, Inc. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/17 1:36 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
1
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 12:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Chico's Fas, Inc. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17455104, filed by Nelson Fernandez.(Duran, Pelayo) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) |