Edwards v. United States of America et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Sullivan |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-01119 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1402 US as Defendant |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Reuel Marquez Lara
|
|
Defendant
United States of American United States Postal Service
|
|
Plaintiff
Ms Daesja Edwards
5800 Quantrell Ave #323
Alexandira, VA 22312 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 04/22 2:10 PM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Reuel Marquez Lara, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/22 12:19 PM
NOTICE by Daesja Edwards re1 Complaint(Murphy, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Daesja Edwards or counsel for Daesja Edwards are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/1/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) | |
3 | 3
order
25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order
Wed 04/17 4:39 PM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 4/17/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2 QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by Daesja Edwards was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summonses for the United States of America, U.S. Attorney and Attorney General. Summons provided for Reuel Marquez Lara was incomplete. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summonses for the United States of America, U.S. Attorney, Attorney General, and Reuel Marquez Lara using the event Notice (Other) and link to 1 Complaint. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) | |
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 12:23 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11208696.), filed by Daesja Edwards.(Murphy, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/17 2:16 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (kns, Deputy Clerk) |
||
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 04/17 4:35 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by Daesja Edwards was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summonses for the United States of America, U.S. Attorney and Attorney General. Summons provided for Reuel Marquez Lara was incomplete. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summonses for the United States of America, U.S. Attorney, Attorney General, and Reuel Marquez Lara using the event Notice (Other) and link to 1 Complaint. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
notice
25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/17 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Daesja Edwards or counsel for Daesja Edwards are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/1/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) |