DURSO v. HIG GROUP INC
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | J Nicholas Ranjan |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00582 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 1:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
HIG GROUP INC
|
|
Plaintiff
JOHN DURSO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Mon 04/29 11:19 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN DURSO. HIG GROUP INC served on 4/26/2024, answer due 5/17/2024. (Paronich, Anthony) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/25 3:34 PM
Summons Issued as to HIG GROUP INC (jkn) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 11:59 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Anthony Paronich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 4/22/2024. (pak) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Errata (to be used by filers)
Thu 04/18 12:26 PM
Errata re2 Praecipe to Issue Summons by JOHN DURSO. Reason for Correction: Missing Pracipe to Issue Summons during initial filing.. (Jackson, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Proposed Summons | ||
4 | 4
misc
Errata (to be used by filers)
Thu 04/18 12:11 PM
Errata re1 COMPLAINT by JOHN DURSO. Reason for Correction: Missing Second page of Cover Sheet. (Jackson, Jeremy) |
|
misc
QC - No Civil Cover Sheet Attached
Thu 04/18 11:07 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Second page of Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required for all civil cases, was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a second page of the civil cover sheet by using the Errata event and linking it to the initiating document. (sdp) |
||
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Thu 04/18 11:12 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re2 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: praecipe not filed only the summons. CORRECTION: refile using eratta event with the praecipe as the main document and summons as attachment; in the future, the summons can be filed with the complaint as an attachment. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)
Wed 04/17 1:16 PM
MOTION for attorney Anthony Paronich to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8221057) by JOHN DURSO. (Paronich, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Anthony Paronich, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Wed 04/17 1:06 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JOHN DURSO (Jackson, Jeremy) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Wed 04/17 12:40 PM
COMPLAINT against HIG GROUP INC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8220946), filed by JOHN DURSO. (Jackson, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 04/19 10:18 AM
Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan added. (sdp) |