Digenan v. Tractor Supply Company, LLC
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Dana M Sabraw |
Referred: | David D Leshner |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00689 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 11:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
Tractor Supply Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Digenan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Danielle Otero by Danielle Alyssa Otero on behalf of Tractor Supply Company, LLC (Otero, Danielle)Attorney Danielle Alyssa Otero added to party Tractor Supply Company, LLC(pty:dft) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
8
pgs
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Wed 04/17 4:07 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 4/17/2024.(ddf) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Fee for Civil Case Opening
Wed 04/17 10:11 AM
Fee for Civil Case Opening: $ 405, receipt number ACASDC-18765839, Paid on 4/17/2024. (no document attached) (Carruth, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 10:00 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 405.), filed by Tractor Supply Company, LLC. The new case number is 3:24-cv-689-DMS-DDL. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case.(axc1) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 3 | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Thu 04/18 11:26 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Tractor Supply Company, LLC. (axc1) (jmo) |