Simms v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections (Citrus County)
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William F Jung |
Referred: | Philip R Lammens |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00188 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing Order - Pro Se Litigants
Wed 04/17 1:55 PM
STANDING ORDER for all incarcerated pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/17/2024. (RLK) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in support
Wed 04/17 1:46 PM
MEMORANDUM in support re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Shane R Simms.(RLK) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 04/17 1:39 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Shane R Simms. (no fees paid, no service copies provided)(RLK) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope |