Northridge Condominium Assn Inc v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon E Deguilio |
Referred: | John E Martin |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00137 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Porter Superior Court, 64D01-2403-CT-002905 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Northridge Condominium Assn Inc
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Mon 04/29 5:15 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 04/29 5:14 PM
ORDER/SET HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2024 09:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties to file a proposed joint discovery plan by 6/7/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/29/2024. (smb) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Mon 04/29 5:07 PM
ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. ByMagistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/29/2024. (smb) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/23 1:42 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE7 State Farm Fire & Casualty Company answer due 5/22/2024. (nae) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 04/22 1:52 PM
NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re6 State Court Complaint Automatic Initial Extension (Carlasare, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 04/18 8:37 AM
Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. **NEW CASE** (ash) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 2:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Pagnamenta, Eric) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A Pagnamenta on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Pagnamenta, Eric) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P Carlasare on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Carlasare, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 04/17 1:51 PM
NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet(Carlasare, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Service list | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5547668.) from Porter Superior Court, Cause No. 64D01-2403-CT-002905, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Carlasare, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-State Court Case Summary, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Certificate of Issuance of Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-State Court Appearance, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F-NOF-Notice of Removal | ||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
State Court Complaint
Thu 04/18 8:35 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in Porter Superior Court, 64D01-2403-CT-002905 against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, filed by Northridge Condominium Assn Inc.(ash) |