Gunther v. O'Malley
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Glenn T Suddaby |
Referred: | Mitchell J Katz |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00530 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/26 4:22 PM
TEXT ORDER: Granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SO ORDERED by US Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on April 26, 2024. (ztc) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner
Thu 04/18 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Vernon Norwood appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 7/17/2024. (Norwood, Vernon) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form
Wed 04/17 11:33 AM
General Order #18 Issued. (kck) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Consent / Declination Form
Wed 04/17 11:32 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by David A. Gunther advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (kck) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 11:31 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David A. Gunther. Motions referred to Mitchell J. Katz. (kck) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Social Security Identification Form - [LODGED]
Wed 04/17 11:25 AM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (kck) |
|
1 | 1
cmpssa
Complaint - Social Security Appeal
Wed 04/17 11:24 AM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] . (kck) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Partially Favorable Decision, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
motion
Notice of Potential Related Case for Judicial Review
Wed 04/17 11:34 AM
TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 5:20-cv-1396 (TWD). (kck) |