United States of America v. J.D. Coleson
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James C Dever, III |
Referred: | Brian S Meyers |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00019 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
J.D. Coleson
P.O. Box 964
Grandy, NC 27939 |
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
United States Attorney Eastern District of North Carolina 150 Fayetteville Street Suite 2100
Raleigh, NC 27601 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Proposed Order
Mon 04/29 9:51 AM
Proposed Order regarding4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America. (Kasper, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
14
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Tue 04/23 9:44 AM
Memorandum in Support regarding4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America. (Kasper, Andrew) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Tue 04/23 9:43 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America. (Kasper, Andrew) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to J.D. Coleson. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) |
|
notice
Notice to Counsel
Fri 04/19 9:03 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-7] Civil Cover Sheet, [1-8] Proposed Summons. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" ( the civil cover sheet and the proposed summons ) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 11:32 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew A. Kasper on behalf of United States of America. (Kasper, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 11:27 AM
COMPLAINT against J.D. Coleson, filed by United States of America. (Kasper, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 1913 Deed, recorded in Deed Book 52 on pages 482-88 at the Currituck County Register of Deeds, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Coinjock, NC Trespass, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Photographs taken by Corps of Engineers Employees, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Letter from the Department of the Army, Corps of Engineers to J.D. Coleson dated February 15, 2023, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Letter from the U.S. Attorney's Office to J.D. Coleson dated February 7, 2024, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Photographs taken by Deputy U.S. Marshal on March 5, 2024, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons |