Baker v. United States of America
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James C Dever, III |
Referred: | Brian S Meyers |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-00353 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | Camp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022 |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
William Richard Baker, Jr.
401 Middle Street P.O. Box 1676
New Bern, NC 28563 |
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 12:34 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Sara Johanna Mirsky on behalf of United States of America. (Mirsky, Sara) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 12:30 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Charles Eagles on behalf of United States of America. (Eagles, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
service
Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case
Thu 04/18 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Sellers, N.) |
||
order
Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 11:01 AM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Philip C. Federico must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/18/2024. (Sellers, N.) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit
Wed 04/17 5:01 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit filed by William Richard Baker, Jr. (Smith, Guy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipt for Pro Hac Vice | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 4:08 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Guy Dixon Smith on behalf of William Richard Baker, Jr. (Smith, Guy) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 4:04 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7570967.), filed by William Richard Baker, Jr. (Smith, Guy) |