Doe (L.M.H.) v. Red Roof Inns, Inc. et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01823 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 2:14 PM EDT |
Defendant
BW RRI II LLC
|
|
Defendant
FMW RRI II LLC
|
|
Defendant
FMW RRI OPCO LLC
|
|
Defendant
RRF Holding Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
RRI West Management, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Red Roof Franchising, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Red Roof Inns, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane (L.M.H.) Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Related Case Memorandum
Tue 04/30 12:28 PM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that case numbers 2:24-cv-1823 and 2:19-cv-755 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 30, 2024. (jlk) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 11:25 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bryan O. Blevins, Jr., Matthew C. Matheny, Colin D. Moore, and Ashlynn K. Alexander as co-counsel. Co-counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/24/2024. (mas) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 10:07 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $800 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9926186) of Bryan O. Blevins; Matthew C. Matheny; Colin D. Moore; Ashlynn K. Alexander by Plaintiff Jane (L.M.H.) Doe. (Jonson, George) |
|
Att: 1 Bryan O. Blevins COGS, | ||
Att: 2 Matthew C. Matheny COGS, | ||
Att: 3 Colin D. Moore COGS, | ||
Att: 4 Ashlynn K. Alexander COGS | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 2:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Jane (L.M.H.) Doe. (Jonson, George) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by George Demetrios Jonson for Plaintiff Jane (L.M.H.) Doe (Jonson, George) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by George Demetrios Jonson for Plaintiff Jane (L.M.H.) Doe (Jonson, George) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 2:00 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against BW RRI II LLC, FMW RRI II LLC, FMW RRI OPCO LLC, RRF Holding Company, LLC, RRI West Management, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9924559), filed by Jane (L.M.H.) Doe. (Jonson, George) |