TAPOSH v. SANDERS et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Trevor N Mcfadden |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01093 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
|
|
Defendant
ROBERT P. SANDERS
|
|
Defendant
MARYBETH TURNER
|
|
Plaintiff
SHAHREAR MD TAPOSH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Wed 05/01 4:18 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/23/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/22/2024.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/30/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANTONY BLINKEN served on 4/30/2024; ROBERT P. SANDERS served on 4/30/2024; MARYBETH TURNER served on 4/30/2024 (Goldstein, Joshua) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
.Order
Fri 04/19 9:47 AM
STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 04/19/2024. (lctnm1) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Fri 04/19 8:52 AM
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/19 8:50 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmw) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Wed 04/17 2:16 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against ANTONY BLINKEN, ROBERT P. SANDERS, MARYBETH TURNER (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by SHAHREAR MD TAPOSH.(Goldstein, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
misc
Payment of Fee - Complaint/Petition
Wed 04/17 2:19 PM
Payment for1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus. ($405; Receipt number ADCDC-10833960). (Goldstein, Joshua) |