Cheatom v. Rockwell Security, LLC et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Roseann A Ketchmark |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00278 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri, 2416-CV06575 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2024 3:34 AM CDT |
Defendant
Cydni (LNU)
|
|
Defendant
Rockwell Security, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ulta Salon Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Davionne Cheatom
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() GREEN CARD showing return of service re 10 Remand letter, docket sheet and certified order of remand. Clerk of Court of Jackson County served on 05/01/2024. (Grube, Cheyenne) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
utility
Remark
Thu 04/25 1:33 PM
***Remark Remand letter, docket sheet and certified order of remand mailed via certified mail (7001 0360 0003 3498 3663) to: Jackson County Clerk of the Court 415 E 12th KANSAS CITY, MO 64106. (Kern, Kendra) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Thu 04/25 9:41 AM
ORDER that8 Defendant's unopposed motion to remand to the Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri, is GRANTED. Signed on 4/25/2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan) |
|
misc
Remand Letter Sent
Thu 04/25 1:26 PM
Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri. This is a text entry only - no document is attached (Kern, Kendra) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 04/24 1:01 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION to remand (Unopposed) filed by Mark Haddad on behalf of Rockwell Security, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/2/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Haddad, Mark) |
|
7 | 7
![]() RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 5/18/2024. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/1/2024. Signed on April 18, 2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Rockwell Security, LLC.(Haddad, Mark) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Woods, Gloria) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of appearance by Mark Haddad on behalf of Rockwell Security, LLC (Attorney Mark Haddad added to party Rockwell Security, LLC(pty:dft))(Haddad, Mark) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of appearance by Michael L. Blumenthal on behalf of Rockwell Security, LLC (Blumenthal, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
![]() DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael L. Blumenthal on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Security, LLC.(Blumenthal, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2416-CV06575, Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8965476.(Blumenthal, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |