Shunstrom v. Cordonnier et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Roseann A Ketchmark |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-03109 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 2:13 PM CDT |
Defendant
Andrew Bailey
|
|
Defendant
Michael J. Cordonnier
|
|
Plaintiff
Alison Y. Shunstrom
1078 S. Weaver Ave.
Springfield, MO 65807 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 05/01 11:56 AM
ORDER: (1) Plaintiff's motion to amend original complaint6 is GRANTED. (2) Plaintiff's initial motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis1 is DENIED as moot. (3) Plaintiff's amended motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis5 is DEFERRED pending Plaintiff's filing of a second amended complaint on or before May 24, 2024. (4) Plaintiff's initial motion to appoint counsel2 and amended motion to appoint counsel7 are DENIED without prejudice. Signed on 5/1/2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Shreves, Darin) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 04/29 4:00 PM
PRO SE MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Alison Y. Shunstrom. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/13/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 04/29 3:59 PM
PRO SE MOTION to amend/correct1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alison Y. Shunstrom. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/13/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/29 3:57 PM
PRO SE AMENDED MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alison Y. Shunstrom. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/13/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Amended Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Letter of reassignment
Fri 04/26 9:32 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris to District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. Judge Morris no longer associated with this case. Please note the new case number: 24-3109 CV-S-RK. (Melvin, Greg) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Transferring/Reassigning Case
Wed 04/17 2:35 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris for all further proceedings. District Judge M. Douglas Harpool no longer assigned to case. (This is a text entry only, no document attached) (Hanna, Jaime) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 04/17 1:56 PM
PRO SE MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Alison Y. Shunstrom. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/1/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 1:55 PM
PRO SE MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alison Y. Shunstrom. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/1/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment
Wed 04/17 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 5/8/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Paper copy mailed to Plaintiff) (Hanna, Jaime) |