Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc. v. Series USA, LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Altonaga |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21439 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 5:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Series USA, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Series, LLC
20900 NE 30TH AVENUE SUITE 901
Miami, FL 33180 |
|
Plaintiff
Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc.
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Initial Disclosure(s)
Wed 04/24 9:17 PM
Initial Disclosure(s) of RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc. (Raines, Alan) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/19 8:46 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Thomas Pasternak. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Thu 04/18 2:07 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc..(Raines, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Chair Design, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Chair Design | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Thu 04/18 1:56 PM
Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas Pasternak. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc.. Responses due by 5/2/2024.(Raines, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate Of Good Standing | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 1:19 PM
ORDER denying5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Thomas Pasternak. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
6 | 6
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 04/18 1:16 PM
ORDER dismissing1 Complaint, filed by Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc.; Amended Complaint due by 4/25/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Thu 04/18 10:10 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas G. Pasternak. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-17457651. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc.. Responses due by 5/2/2024.(Jimenez, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
misc
Form AO 120/121
Thu 04/18 7:59 AM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (scn) |
|
Att: 1 18 pgs Complaint & Exhibits | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 7:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Series USA, LLC, Series, LLC. (scn) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 04/18 7:43 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 5:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17456763, filed by Ducharme Seating International 1991, Inc..(Jimenez, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s) |