Lutfi v. North Broward Hospital District et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David S Leibowitz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60625 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 17th Judicial Circuit Court, in and for Broward Co, CACE-24-004055 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 5:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Rose Centeno
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dusan Dragovich
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Calvin Glidewell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
North Broward Hospital District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tatiana Pestana
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jared Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bashar Lutfi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Wed 05/01 2:00 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bashar Lutfi.(OBeidy, A.) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/25 5:12 PM
STATUS REPORT Removal by Rose Centeno, Dusan Dragovich, Calvin Glidewell, North Broward Hospital District, Tatiana Pestana, Jared Smith (Stearns, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 04/23 11:43 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Calvin Glidewell, Dusan Dragovich, Jared Smith, Rose Centeno, North Broward Hospital District, Tatiana Pestana. Jared Smith served on 4/20/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024.(Stearns, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Verified Return of Service of 20-Day Summons and Complaint | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 04/23 8:34 AM
ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS: The Defendants shall file their responses and motions jointly. Failure to comply with these procedures may result in sanctions, including the striking of the motion(s) or response(s). Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Status Report Order
Thu 04/18 8:17 AM
ORDER: Counsel for the removing party is directed to file and serve a Removal Status Report as described below no later than April 25, 2024. Failure to file a timely Removal Status Report shall be ground for remand. In addition to the Removal Status Report, counsel for the removing party must file copies of all records in the state court proceedings by that date. Status Report due by 4/25/2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 4/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 04/17 4:41 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Wed 04/17 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17456494, filed by Calvin Glidewell, Dusan Dragovich, Jared Smith, Rose Centeno, North Broward Hospital District d/b/a Broward Health, Tatiana Pestana. (No ANswer/ Motion to Dismiss Filed)(Stearns, Christopher) Modified Text on 4/17/2024 (wce) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Pleadings |