Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:W Louis Sands
Case #: 7:24-cv-00033
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
CauseAmericans With Disabilities Act, et seq
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2024
Terminated:Jul 22, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2024 4:19 AM EDT
Defendant
US DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS
Plaintiff
ALIKA SEAY
2279 DEWBERRY RD
QUITMAN, GA 31643

GPO May 01 2024
ORDER Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, the Court provides this notice to Plaintiff in accordance with Rule 4(m) and INFORMS and INSTRUCTS the Plaintiff to serve the summons and the Complaint 1 to Defendant in accordance with the Federal Rules by Tuesday, July 16, 2024. Failure to properly serve the Defendant by Tuesday, July 16, 2024, may result in the instant action getting dismissed without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 5/1/2024. (ksl)
GPO Jul 22 2024
ORDER Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to serve the Defendants and for failure to comply with the Court's Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/22/2024. (ksl)
GPO Jul 22 2024
JUDGMENT of dismissal. (ksl)
GPO Nov 07 2024
ORDER denying 7 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/7/2024. (ksl)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, November 07, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Thu 11/07 9:57 AM
ORDER denying7 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 11/7/2024. (ksl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
7 7 motion Reconsideration Tue 08/06 2:47 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re5 Order,6 Judgment Filed by ALIKA SEAY.(ksl)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
6 6 order Judgment Mon 07/22 3:37 PM
JUDGMENT of dismissal. (ksl)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Mon 07/22 3:23 PM
ORDER Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to serve the Defendants and for failure to comply with the Court's Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 7/22/2024. (ksl)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
4 4 misc Application to Clerk for Entry of Default Mon 07/15 3:00 PM
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against US DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS.(ksl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USPS Text Notification of Delivery
order Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 07/15 3:36 PM
Plaintiffs Request for CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to US DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS is DECLINED - Proper service not perfected. There is no information provided that service was accomplished in accordance with Rule 4(i). (ksl)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 06/10 4:29 PM
Summons Issued as to US DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS. (ksl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
utility REMARK Thu 05/02 8:23 AM
REMARK : Rule 4 package mailed to plaintiff. (ksl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/01 4:36 PM
ORDER Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, the Court provides this notice to Plaintiff in accordance with Rule 4(m) and INFORMS and INSTRUCTS the Plaintiff to serve the summons and the Complaint1 to Defendant in accordance with the Federal Rules by Tuesday, July 16, 2024. Failure to properly serve the Defendant by Tuesday, July 16, 2024, may result in the instant action getting dismissed without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE W LOUIS SANDS on 5/1/2024. (ksl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
1 1 misc Complaint Wed 04/17 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS filed by ALIKA SEAY(ksl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope