Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:24-cv-00157
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2024
Case in other court:IN THE NOBLE CIRCUIT COURT, 57C01-2402-CT-000019
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By
Hunter T Edmonds
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Brittney B Rykovich
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Mediator
Michael Langford
Plaintiff
William Kitchen
Represented By
Bradford James Smith
Ken Nunn Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/21 10:51 AM
ORDER: The Court SETS a telephonic status conference on 5/27/2025, at 11:00 am ET, to discuss the motion for leave to amend complaint24 ; and TAKES UNDER ADVISEMENT the parties' request for an extension of time29 , to be discussed further at the status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 5/21/2025. (ash)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 05/21 10:52 AM
Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/27/2025 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (per32 order) (ash)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
31 31 order Order Wed 05/14 10:56 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The proposed30 Order filed by Dft is hereby STRICKEN as proposed orders are not to be filed in a separate docket entry on the record. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
30 30 motion Stipulation Mon 05/12 3:36 PM
STIPULATION Proposed Order by Defendant Robert Bosch LLC. (Edmonds, Hunter)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/12 3:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Extend Case Management Deadlines by Defendant Robert Bosch LLC. (Edmonds, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
28 28 misc Statement Wed 04/30 3:47 PM
STATEMENT SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT TO UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT regarding24 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Unopposed) filed by William Kitchen. (Smith, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 04/25 3:21 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is allotted another chance to demonstrate to the Court the proposed defendants' citizenship for diversity jurisdiction purposes and is AFFORDED to and including 05/02/2025, to file a second supplemental statement to the motion to amend24 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 04/25/2025. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
26 26 motion Supplement Mon 04/14 3:11 PM
MOTION to Supplement24 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Unopposed) by Plaintiff William Kitchen. (Smith, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 04/10 4:38 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is AFFORDED to and including 4/17/2025, to file a supplemental statement to the motion to amend24 , setting forth the proposed defendants' citizenship for diversity jurisdiction purposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 4/10/2025. (ash)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
24 24 motion Amend/Correct Wed 04/02 7:53 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Unopposed) by Plaintiff William Kitchen.(Smith, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
23 23 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 02/11 11:08 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins: The Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel22 is granted. Attorney Kelly V Milam is withdrawn on behalf of Defendant, Robert Bosch LLC. Text entry order. (ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 02/10 3:48 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Robert Bosch LLC. (Milam, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Tue 12/03 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information Change of Firm Information (Edmonds, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/19 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly V Milam on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC (Milam, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/05 4:38 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 06/28/2024. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 06/04/2025. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 08/05/2025; and from Defendant by 09/04/2025. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 09/04/2024; as to Defendant is 10/04/2024. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 07/07/2025, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties have agreed upon Mike Langford as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 06/05/2024. (jdb)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Wed 06/05 10:53 AM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/5/2024 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Bradford Smith. Dft appeared by atty Hunter Edmonds. Court addresses subject matter jurisdiction. Atty Smith advises Pla's demand will be in excess of the $75,000 threshold. The17 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Mike Langford appointed as mediator. Atty Smith to notify mediator by letter, copy to atty Edmonds. Magistrate Consent forms due by 6/26/2024. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Tue 06/04 10:32 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Edmonds, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
16 16 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 05/20 1:25 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Plaintiff's15 Unopposed Motion for Continuance is granted. The telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2024 at 11:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 6/5/2024 at 10:30 am. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time. Text entry order. (mr)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Continue Mon 05/20 10:58 AM
MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial Conference (Unopposed) by Plaintiff William Kitchen.(Smith, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Unopposed motion email
Friday, May 17, 2024
14 14 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Fri 05/17 11:08 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Fri 05/17 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2024 at 11:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time. (mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/30 4:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Bosch LLC. (Edmonds, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
11 11 misc Statement Fri 04/26 7:20 AM
STATEMENT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF . (Smith, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Opinion and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 04/25 12:11 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant is AFFORDED to and including 5/1/2024, to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement that adequately articulates Defendant's citizenship. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 4/24/24. (nhc)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/24 4:50 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Robert Bosch LLC.(Edmonds, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/19 4:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Bosch LLC identifying Corporate Parent Robert Bosch North America Corporation for Robert Bosch LLC.. (Edmonds, Hunter)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 04/19 1:48 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Dft is ordered to file an amended disclosure statement that fully complies with FRCP 7.1(a)(2) on or before 4/26/2024. The disclosure statement6 is noncompliant. Pla is ordered to file a disclosure statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a)(2) on or before 4/26/2024. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/18 3:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Bosch LLC identifying Corporate Parent Robert Bosch North America Corporation for Robert Bosch LLC.. (Edmonds, Hunter)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/18 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford James Smith on behalf of William Kitchen (Smith, Bradford)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/18 9:57 AM
Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. **NEW CASE** (ash)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/17 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brittney B Rykovich on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC (Rykovich, Brittney)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/17 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter T Edmonds on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC (Edmonds, Hunter)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/17 5:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5548185.) from IN THE NOBLE CIRCUIT COURT, Cause No. 57C01-2402-CT-000019, filed by Robert Bosch LLC.(Edmonds, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
Monday, February 26, 2024
5 5 cmp State Court Complaint Thu 04/18 9:53 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in Noble County Circuit Court, 57C01-2402-CT-000019 against Robert Bosch LLC, filed by William Kitchen.(ash)
Related: [-]