McDaniel v. J.R. Simplot Company
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Greg N Stivers |
Referred: | H Brent Brennenstuhl |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00059 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441nr Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Simpson Circuit Court, 24-CI-00061 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 5:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
J.R. Simplot Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry McDaniel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/25 4:24 PM
ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (EBOC) by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/25/2024. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2024 at 10:30 AM CDT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The Court to initiate the call. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties by 5/15/2024. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/29/2024. See Order for details. cc: counsel, K.Lovell-CM (DeW) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Rule 73 Notice of Magistrate Judges - Trial by Consent
Wed 04/24 10:57 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or non-jury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a Magistrate Judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the[LINK:Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge] and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at[LINK:intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov] . (TJD) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order - TEXT ONLY Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/24 10:55 AM
TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/24/2024; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/24 10:25 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by J.R. Simplot Company. (Lemly, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2))
Wed 04/17 5:09 PM
Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by J.R. Simplot Company. (Lemly, Benjamin) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Deficiency
Wed 04/17 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Missing Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/24/2024. (KDY) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/17 3:37 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE to Simpson Circuit Court and counsel of record/parties re1 Notice of Removal. (KDY) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1))
Wed 04/17 3:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Simplot AB Retail, Inc., Corporate Parent Simplot Grower Solutions for J.R. Simplot Company. (KDY) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Wed 04/17 3:31 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (KDY) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by J.R. Simplot Company from Simpson Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-00061. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4015641) (KDY) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Gina LeBeouf-Hatchett, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Sheet |