Adeyinka v. Akintomide
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Stephanie A Gallagher |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01129 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1651 All Writs Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 5:12 PM EDT |
Claimant
Mrs. Joyce Adeyinka
4705 Dark Star Way
Owings Mills, MD 21117 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mr. Olalekan Akintomide
8159 Shoal Creek Drive
Laurel, MD 20724 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 04/22 9:27 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal; CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/22/2024. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Saturday, April 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Sat 04/20 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joyce Adeyinka(Oluyemi, Grace) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 04/18 1:38 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction on or before April 25, 2024. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/18/2024. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/18 12:03 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (kns, Deputy Clerk) |
||
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 04/18 1:10 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by Joyce Adeyinka was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil cover sheet and proposed summons. To correct this problem, file Civil cover sheet and proposed summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil cover sheet and proposed summons to 1 . **Pursuant to Local Rule 102.2.a, a complaint caption shall contain the names and addresses of all parties and the county of residence. Please refile corrected complaint. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 5:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Joyce Adeyinka ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11210805.), filed by Joyce Adeyinka.(Oluyemi, Grace) |