Burns v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Paul J Barbadoro |
Referred: | Andrea K Johnstone |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00106 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 5:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert D Burns, Administrator of the Estate of Tami D. Burns
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extend Time
Tue 04/30 4:50 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to May 31, 2024 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..Follow up on Objection on 5/14/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Seeley, Donald) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
State Court Record
Mon 04/22 3:56 PM
Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2024-CV-00185, Strafford County Superior Court(Seeley, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Certified State Record - Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Certified State Record -Part 3, | ||
Att: 3 Certified State Record -Part 4, | ||
Att: 4 Certified State Record -Part 5, | ||
Att: 5 Certified State Record -Part 6, | ||
Att: 6 Certified State Record -Part 7, | ||
Att: 7 Certified State Record -Part 8, | ||
Att: 8 Certified State Record -Part 9, | ||
Att: 9 Certified State Record -Part 10 | ||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 10:00 AM
Diversity of Citizenship Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to them. (Seeley, Donald) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 9:54 AM
Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Seeley, Donald) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice - ECF
Thu 04/18 4:43 PM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website[LINK:HERE] .(ed) |
||
notice
Case Opening Error
Thu 04/18 4:50 PM
NOTICE re1 Notice of Removal - New Case,, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by April 25, 2024. Disclosure Statement due 4/25/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ed) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 04/17 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hale Yazicioglu Lake on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Attorney Hale Yazicioglu Lake added to party Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lake, Hale) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal - New Case
Wed 04/17 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Strafford Superior, case number 219-2024-CV-00185 (filing fee $405, receipt number ANHDC-2500371) filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 5/8/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 5/1/2024.(Seeley, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Summons, Complaint, Motion, Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 04/18 4:42 PM
Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro and US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:24-cv-106-PB-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed) |