North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Graham Mullen
Case #: 1:24-cv-00115
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
49 49 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 04/29 9:27 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re48 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mark Geouge, Levi Johnson, C.J. Wilson.(Flanagan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of C.J. Wilson,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Levi Johnson,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Geouge
48 48 motion Summary Judgment Tue 04/29 9:24 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mark Geouge, Levi Johnson, C.J. Wilson. Responses due by 5/13/2025 (Flanagan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
46 46 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 04/25 4:29 PM
MOTION Request for an Appointment of Counsel by Joseph Wayne Riddle. (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment for Request for Counsel,
Att: 2 Envelope
45 45 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Subpoena Request by Joseph Wayne Riddle (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Envelope
44 44 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/25 4:19 PM
Renewed Amended MOTION to Compel Production of Requested Evidence by Joseph Wayne Riddle. Responses due by 5/9/2025 (sc) (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Att: 3 (4/25/2025) Declaration
43 43 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/25 4:09 PM
Plaintiff's Dispositive MOTION in Matter Case No: 1:24-cv-115-GCM by Joseph Wayne Riddle. Responses due by 5/9/2025 (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-J,
Att: 2 Cover Letter,
Att: 3 Envelope
Monday, April 21, 2025
42 42 misc Letter Tue 04/22 2:34 PM
Letter regarding Plaintiff viewing flash drive while in custody from NCDAC on behalf of Joseph Riddle. No case number provided by filer. Clerk docketed in this case after a review of the litigants docket sheets. (smm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope from Attorney,
Att: 2 Gray flash drive,
Att: 3 Envelope
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
41 41 order Protective Order Wed 04/02 1:48 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/2/2025. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kab)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
40 40 motion Protective Order Mon 03/31 1:05 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Mark Geouge, Levi Johnson, C.J. Wilson. Responses due by 4/14/2025 (Flanagan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
39 39 4 pgs order Order Fri 03/07 2:38 PM
ORDER denying re 38 Request for Subpoena. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 03/07/2025. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
38 38 misc Miscellaneous Filing Mon 03/03 3:36 PM
Request for Issue of Subpoena by Joseph Wayne Riddle.(mdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, February 20, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 02/20 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Wayne Riddle. Address updated from Granville Correctional Institution Box 2500 Butner, NC 27509 to Foothills Correctional Institution 5150 Western Ave. Morganton, NC 28655 (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
36 36 motion Extension of Time Thu 02/20 11:14 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time for Discovery by Joseph Wayne Riddle. Responses due by 3/6/2025 (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 02/20 12:59 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying 36 Motion for Extension of Time for Discovery. Text of Order: Plaintiff's motion is DENIED as moot in light of the Court's Order at Docket No. 35. The Clerk is respectfully instructed to resend the 35 Court's Order to Plaintiff at his new address at Foothills Correctional Institution. So Ordered. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/20/2025. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(KP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
35 35 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 02/18 4:03 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Extension of Time for Request of Discovery Discovery due by 3/31/2025. Motions due by 4/30/2025. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/18/2025. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mdp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
34 34 motion Extension of Time Wed 02/12 9:20 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time for Request of Discovery by Joseph Wayne Riddle. Responses due by 2/25/2025 (mdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 01/16 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Wayne Riddle. Address provided has already been updated.(mdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, January 13, 2025
32 32 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Mon 01/13 11:51 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice 26 Motion to Compel; and denying without prejudice 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/13/2025. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kab)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 01/13 11:52 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 3/6/2025. (kab)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 12/30 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address from McDowell County Jail to Granville Correctional Institute by Joseph Wayne Riddle. No case number provided by filer. Clerk docketed in this case after a review of the litigant's docket sheet. (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, December 23, 2024
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/23 11:42 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Response to include two unpublished cases not previously provided by C.J. Wilson, Mark Geouge, Levi Johnson. Replies due by 12/30/2024 (Flanagan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/20 3:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION to Compel by C.J. Wilson, Mark Geouge, Levi Johnson. Replies due by 12/27/2024 (Flanagan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/12 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Marie Owens on behalf of C.J. Wilson, Mark Geouge, Levi Johnson (Owens, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
27 27 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 12/11 4:05 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Joseph Wayne Riddle. (tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
order Oral or Text-Only Order Tue 12/10 2:16 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Text of Order: In light of Plaintiffs pending 26 Motion to Compel, the Court sua sponte extends the dispositive motions deadline in this matter to January 21, 2025. So Ordered. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/10/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kab)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
26 26 motion Compel Tue 12/10 11:35 AM
MOTION to Compel by Joseph Wayne Riddle. Responses due by 12/23/2024 (mdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, November 18, 2024
order Oral or Text-Only Order Mon 11/18 4:10 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER re 25 Notice of Change of Address filed by Joseph Wayne Riddle Text of Order: In light of Plaintiff's 25 filing, the Clerk is respectfully instructed to update the docket in this matter to reflect Defendant Mark Gouges true full name as Mark Geouge. (Per PSLC1) So Ordered.. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/18/2024. (mdp) Modified docket text on 11/18/2024 (mdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 11/18 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Wayne Riddle (Docket already reflected this change.)(mdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time Wed 10/16 11:00 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests by Mark Gouge, Levi Johnson, C.J. Wilson. Responses due by 10/30/2024 (Flanagan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 10/16 11:19 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests. Text of Order: Defendants shall have until November 22, 2024, to respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests. The Court sua sponte extends the discovery deadline in this matter to November 22, 2024. So Ordered. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/16/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (KP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 09/24 12:38 PM
ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint by Mark Gouge, Levi Johnson, C.J. Wilson.(Flanagan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order Mon 09/16 2:12 PM
ORDER re 21 Pro Se Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, Dispositions of Fact Witnesses is STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/16/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
21 21 misc Miscellaneous Filing Tue 09/10 1:44 PM
Pro Se Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, Dispositions of Fact Witnesses by Joseph Wayne Riddle.(tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/03 4:03 PM
PRO SE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Gouge, Levi Johnson, C.J. Wilson filed by Joseph Wayne Riddle.(kab)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Issued Tue 09/03 3:52 PM
Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Mark Gouge.(kab)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM 285
18 18 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 09/03 3:04 PM
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/3/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kab)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
17 17 motion Leave to File Document Mon 08/26 3:42 PM
Pro se MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Join Parties by Joseph Wayne Riddle. Responses due by 9/9/2024 (mdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Envelope,
Att: 5 Envelope Back
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Tue 08/06 12:01 PM
ORDER denying 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/6/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kab)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
14 14 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 08/02 2:46 PM
Pro Se MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Joseph Wayne Riddle. (tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, July 22, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/22 11:40 AM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Motions to Amend & Join Parties due by 9/11/2024. Discovery due by 11/20/2024. Motions due by 12/20/2024. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/22/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/18 3:47 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Levi Johnson, C.J. Wilson.(Flanagan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 07/08 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address from Yancey County Jail to McDowell County Jail by Joseph Wayne Riddle. (smm) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/8/2024) (smm). Regenerated NEF. Modified text on 7/8/2024 (smm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/05 8:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Levi Johnson served on 6/27/2024, answer due 7/18/2024. (cly)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/05 8:18 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to C.J. Wilson served on 6/27/2024, answer due 7/18/2024. (cly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 05/29 3:15 PM
Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Levi Johnson, C.J. Wilson. (smm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM-285s
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
6 6 10 pgs order Order Wed 05/15 3:43 PM
ORDER re 1 Complaint that Plaintiffs First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendant Johnson and Plaintiffs Fourth Amendment claim against Defendant Wilson based on alleged sexual assault survive initial review in accordance with this Order. Plaintiffs remaining claims, including his official capacity claims, are DISMISSED.Defendants Gouge, Smith, and Robinson are DISMISSED as Defendants in this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/15/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kab)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Directing Monthly Prisoner Payment Mon 05/13 8:46 AM
ORDER granting in forma pauperis status and the correctional facility is to transmit partial payments. The initial partial filing fee is waived. Signed by Clerk Katherine H. Simon on 5/13/2024. (Copy of Order served by mail.) (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (smm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
4 4 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Fri 05/03 11:02 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement as to Joseph Wayne Riddle (Sealed - Court) . (cly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Order,
Att: 2 Envelope from Yancey County Sheriff's Office
Thursday, April 18, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order for Prisoner Trust Account Statement Thu 04/18 11:09 AM
ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk, Katherine Hord Simon. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (smm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
2 2 misc Affidavit - 1983 Application IFP Wed 04/17 3:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Joseph Wayne Riddle. (cly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/17 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT against C.J. Wilson, Mark Gouge, William Smith, Michael Robinson, Levi Johnson, filed by Joseph Wayne Riddle. (cly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Inmate Handbook,
Att: 2 Grievance Documents - darkest setting,
Att: 3 Proposed Summonses,
Att: 4 Envelope
order Order of Instructions Wed 04/17 3:58 PM
Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Pro Se Prisoner Civil Actions. Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/17/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (cly)
Related: [-]