Bendix et al v. United States of America
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Ann L Aiken |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00657 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1346 Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 2:13 PM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
William Bendix
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mariana Dukes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 04/23 11:25 AM
Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eiva, Travis) |
|
10 | 10
service
Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 04/23 11:22 AM
Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eiva, Travis) |
|
9 | 9
service
Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 04/23 11:19 AM
Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on United States of America served on 4/18/2024 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eiva, Travis) |
|
8 | 8
service
Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 04/23 11:16 AM
Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on United States of America served on 4/19/2024 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eiva, Travis) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 12:19 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw) |
|
5 | 5
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Thu 04/18 11:59 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/16/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/16/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 9/16/2024. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw) |
|
oth_evt
Correction of the Record
Thu 04/18 2:08 PM
Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding3 Civil Cover Sheet. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The PDF was not flattened. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 1:03 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 4/17/2024 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) |
|
3 | 3
oth_doc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/17 12:41 PM
Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint1 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eiva, Travis) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons
Wed 04/17 12:38 PM
Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Eiva, Travis) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 12:28 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9373532 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by William Bendix and Mariana Dukes against United States of America. (Eiva, Travis) Modified on 4/17/2024 to correct name of defendant. NEF regenerated. (jw) |