Achs et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01994 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Ohio Southern, 3:24-cv-00093 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2024 4:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
National Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EI DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Blvd.
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leah Purdon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Purdon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin McLaughlin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Lou Kreusch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Weisner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christy Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Hoke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Hoke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Heyne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Hays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mikel Hays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catherine Hauser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Fink
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Callahan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Achs
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 04/17 3:53 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ohio Southern (associated as of 4/17/2024), 3:24-cv-00093, Achs et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-01994-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
26 | 26
![]() Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 3:24-cv-00093. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
25 | 25
![]() CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-181): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MDL, this action is transferred to the District of South Carolina. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 4/15/2024; certified by the Clerk's Office from SCD on 4/16/2024. (er) |
|
Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/17/2024.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Not MDL
Wed 04/17 9:48 AM
Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() |
|
22 | 22
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |