GREENE v. DAVIS et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amit P Mehta |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01096 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 6:11 PM EDT |
Cross Claimant
MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.
|
|
Cross Defendant
BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD FEDERAL EMPLOYEE PROGRAM
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
CAREFIRST COMMUNITY HEALTH PLAN OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TERENCE DAVIS, ESQ.
|
|
Defendant
MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.
|
|
Plaintiff
RITA GREENE
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/25 2:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Cross-Defendants to Respond to Cross-Plaintiff's Crossclaim for Interpleader. Cross-Defendants shall respond to the Crossclaim on or before May 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/25/2024. (lcapm3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/25 6:52 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to crossclaim due by 5/24/2024. (zcdw) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 04/22 2:56 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Crossclaim for Interpleader by BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD FEDERAL EMPLOYEE PROGRAM, CAREFIRST COMMUNITY HEALTH PLAN OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Feinberg, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Thu 04/18 10:40 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Trusted Health Plan (District of Columbia), Inc.) by CAREFIRST COMMUNITY HEALTH PLAN OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Feinberg, Adam) |
|
4 | 4
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Thu 04/18 10:37 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (BCBSA) by BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD FEDERAL EMPLOYEE PROGRAM (Feinberg, Adam) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel/Party
Thu 04/18 8:23 AM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 04/17 5:15 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption by BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD FEDERAL EMPLOYEE PROGRAM, CAREFIRST COMMUNITY HEALTH PLAN OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Feinberg, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, case number 2023-CAB-007865 Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADCDC-10834702 filed by CAREFIRST COMMUNITY HEALTH PLAN OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, BLUECROSS BLUESHIELD FEDERAL EMPLOYEE PROGRAM.(Feinberg, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - All Process, Pldgs, Orders Rec'd, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Decl. of B. Stuhan, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Stuhan Decl. 2013 Contract, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Stuhan Decl. 2022 Contract, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Stuhan Decl. 2021 Contract Amendment, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D to Stuhan Decl. 2023 Contract Amendment, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E to Stuhan Decl. 2021 Statement of Benefits, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F to Stuhan Decl. 2022 Statement of Benefits, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G to Stuhan Decl. 2023 Statement of Benefits, | ||
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/18 8:19 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (znmw) |