Maine District Court
Judge:John A Woodcock, Jr
Referred: John C Nivison
Case #: 1:24-cv-00129
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 17, 2024
Terminated:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 14, 2024 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
THOMAS AGENCY
Plaintiff
JOHN KENNEDY FRENCH
40 WESTERN AVENUE, SUITE 864
AUGUSTA, ME 04330

GPO Jun 13 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 Complaint 5 and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
GPO Jul 08 2024
ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE terminating 5 Order to Show Cause ; accepting 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION; dismissing without prejudice 1 Complaint By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)

Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
9 9 order Judgment Thu 07/25 9:20 AM
AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of THOMAS AGENCY against JOHN KENNEDY FRENCH By DEPUTY CLERK: Joanne McCue. (jam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
8 8 order Judgment Tue 07/09 9:21 AM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL By DEPUTY CLERK: Joanne McCue. (jam)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Order to Show Cause Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 07/08 4:30 PM
ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE terminating5 Order to Show Cause ; accepting6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION; dismissing without prejudice1 Complaint By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
6 6 motion Report and Recommended Decision Thu 06/13 3:24 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re1 Complaint5 and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
5 5 1 pgs motion Order to Show Cause Mon 05/13 10:57 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/3/2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
notice Notice to Pro Se Re First Filing & Address Updates Thu 04/25 3:11 PM
NOTICE: Recently JOHN KENNEDY FRENCH filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties] including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (cjd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs Fri 04/19 12:36 PM
ORDER denying2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/19 12:37 PM
Set Deadlines: Filing Fee or completed application to proceed without prepayment of fees and costs due by 5/3/2024. (MFS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs Wed 04/17 2:48 PM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by JOHN KENNEDY FRENCH (cjd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/17 2:46 PM
COMPLAINT against THOMAS AGENCY with Jury Demand, filed by JOHN KENNEDY FRENCH. (Service of Process Deadline 7/16/2024)(cjd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope