Good Mariner LLC v. Accelerant Specialty Insurance Company et al
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | William E Smith |
Referred: | Lincoln D Almond |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00152 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2024 6:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2300289
NY, NY 10017
|
|
Defendant
Accelerant Specialty Insurance Company
an Arkansas corporation c/o Corporation Service Company 300 Spring Building Suite 900 300 S. Spring Street
Little Rock, AR 72201 |
|
Defendant
Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
an Illinois corporation 8125 Sedgwick Way
Memphis, TN 38125 |
|
Plaintiff
Good Mariner LLC
a Rhode Island limited liability company 130 Bellevue Avenue
Newport, RI 02840 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply to Response
Wed 08/28 11:14 PM
REPLY to Response re29 Response to Motion, to Dismiss filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc..(Keable, Cale) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Unpublished Opinion | ||
30 | 30
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Wed 08/28 8:56 PM
Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to23 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Good Mariner LLC(a Rhode Island limited liability company).(Pla, Gabriel) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 08/21 11:51 PM
RESPONSE In Opposition to24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Good Mariner LLC(a Rhode Island limited liability company). Replies due by 8/28/2024.(Pla, Gabriel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply to Response
Wed 08/14 11:19 PM
REPLY to Response re27 Response to Motion, for Leave to Amend the Second Amended Complaint filed by Good Mariner LLC(a Rhode Island limited liability company).(Pla, Gabriel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Rule 26(f) Conference Held on July 1, 2024 | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 08/07 11:05 PM
RESPONSE In Opposition to22 MOTION for Leave to File Document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Second Amended Complaint [DE 21] filed by All Defendants. Replies due by 8/14/2024. (Keable, Cale) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/07 9:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2300289. (Keable, Cale) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/07 9:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Accelerant Specialty Insurance Company. (Keable, Cale) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Dismiss for failure to State a Claim
Wed 08/07 9:52 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. Responses due by 8/21/2024.(Keable, Cale) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law | ||
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim
Wed 08/07 9:47 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Accelerant Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2300289.(Keable, Cale) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Policy, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit ROR & EUO | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 07/24 7:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Second Amended Complaint [DE 21] filed by Good Mariner LLC. Responses due by 8/7/2024.(Pla, Gabriel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Marine insurance policy, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff claim number NMA23005550, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Composite email correspondence, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Composite follow-up email correspondence, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Email last correspondence, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Reservation of Rights Letter, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Renewal Questionnaire, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Marina Clean-up, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Cost of Marina Services, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Fire Extinguisher Service, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Third Party Letter, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - Composite alleged wrong "Karen McWilliams", | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - Composite Plaintiff requests to produce criminal records, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 - Sedgwick alleged wrong "Karen McWilliams | ||
21 | 21
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 07/24 6:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Accelerant Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2300289, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., filed by Good Mariner LLC.(Pla, Gabriel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Marine Insurance Policy, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff claim number NMA23005550, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Composite email correspondence, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Composite follow-up email correspondence, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Email last correspondence, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Reservation of Rights Letter, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Renewal Questionnaire responses, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Nautor Swan Marina, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Nautor Swan Marinas services costs, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Fire extinguisher warranty, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Third Party Letter | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 07/19 2:32 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's19 Motion for Leave to Amend the Amended Complaint as unopposed. Plaintiff is directed to file its amended complaint without track changes by July 26, 2024. Defendant Sedwick Claims Management Services, Inc.'s16 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 7/19/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
respoth
Answer to Counterclaim
Mon 07/08 6:46 PM
Plaintiff's Answer and Affirmative Defenses in Response to Defendants Counterclaim Reply to Counterclaim by Good Mariner LLC. (Pla, Gabriel) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 07/01 10:16 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct12 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Good Mariner LLC. Responses due by 7/15/2024.(Pla, Gabriel) |
|
Att: 1 Second Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Insurance Policy, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Claim, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Composite Defendants Email Correspondence, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Composite Plaintiffs Email Correspondence, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Defendants Correspondence 11/8/23, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Reservation of Rights Letter, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Renewal Questionnaire, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Marina Clean-up, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Cost of Marina Services, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Fire Extinguisher Service, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Third Party Letter | ||
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/17 5:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sedgwick Global Inc. for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc... (Keable, Cale) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 06/17 5:06 PM
Defendant' ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against Good Mariner LLC by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2300289, Accelerant Specialty Insurance Company.(Keable, Cale) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss for failure to State a Claim
Mon 06/17 5:00 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. Responses due by 7/1/2024.(Keable, Cale) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Memorandum | ||
Wednesday, May 15, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/15 1:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Good Mariner LLC. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2300289 waiver sent on 4/18/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra) |
|
14 | 14
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/15 1:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Good Mariner LLC. Accelerant Specialty Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/18/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra) |
|
13 | 13
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/15 12:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Good Mariner LLC. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. waiver sent on 4/18/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (Pla, Gabriel) |
|
misc
Corrective Docket Entry
Wed 05/15 11:38 AM
CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding:9 Waiver of Service Executed,10 Waiver of Service Executed. The waivers were filed using the wrong sent date. Counsel will be refiling with the correct date. This will generate a new answer date. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra) |
||
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 05/10 5:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Accelerant Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2300289, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., filed by Good Mariner LLC.(Pla, Gabriel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Insurance Policy Contract, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Claim Opened & Claim Number issued, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Plaintiff's Cooperation with Defendants' request, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-Plaintiff's Follow-up Correspondence, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5-Defendants' Last Correspondence to Date, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6-Reservation of Rights Letter, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7-Renewal Questionaire Responses re Karen McWilliams, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8-Marina Cleanup & Transport Efforts, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9-Outstanding Marina Invoice/Expense, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10-Certification Re Timely Fire Extinguisher Servicing, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11-Third Party Letter | ||
Wednesday, May 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/08 6:35 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Good Mariner LLC. (Pla, Gabriel) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/01 4:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Good Mariner LLC. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2300289 waiver sent on 4/30/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. |
|
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/01 3:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Good Mariner LLC. Accelerant Specialty Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/30/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 3:17 PM
MOTION for Michael T. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1989067 ) filed by Good Mariner LLC. |
|
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 3:15 PM
MOTION for Gabriel Pla to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-1989063 ) filed by Good Mariner LLC. |
|
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 4:09 PM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gabriel Pla. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/29/2024. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/29 4:13 PM
TEXT ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael T. Moore. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/29/2024. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Brent Regan on behalf of Good Mariner LLC |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Brent Regan on behalf of Good Mariner LLC |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 9:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Accelerant Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Cover Note No. B0507RN2300289, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to Accelerant Specialty Insurance Company | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Request
Thu 04/18 9:42 AM
Summons Request filed by Good Mariner LLC. |
|
2 | 2
notice
Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)
Thu 04/18 9:24 AM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/18 8:55 AM
Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - New Case
Wed 04/17 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-1985465 ), filed by Good Mariner LLC. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 12 Summons - Accelerant, | ||
Att: 13 Summons - Sedgwick, | ||
Att: 14 Summons - Lloyd's |