Thomas v. O'Malley
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Jerusha T Adams |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00229 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/01 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Dalton Windham on behalf of Martin J. O'Malley (Windham, Robert) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/19 8:50 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Martin J. O'Malley. (CWL) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/19 8:47 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Donnie Thomas. (CWL) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Fri 04/19 8:47 AM
***Pursuant to7 - Attorney James Joseph DuBois for Martin J. O'Malley added. (no pdf) (CWL) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Social Security Scheduling Order
Thu 04/18 12:28 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: the Commissioner's Answer to Social Security Complaint and Administrative Record are due within 60 days after entry of the Clerk's notice of service; plaintiff to file brief in support within 30 days of filing of the answer and administrative record; defendant's responsive brief due within 30 days of plaintiff's brief filing; plaintiff may file a reply brief within 14 days of responsive brief filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/18/2024. (CWL) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 12:26 PM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that the motion (Doc. No. 2 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/18/2024. (CWL) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/18 8:46 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams. (CWL) |
|
service
Notice: Social Security Case Service
Thu 04/18 8:47 AM
Notice: Social Security Case Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 USC 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No Summons shall issue. Martin J. O'Malley answer due 6/17/2024. (CWL) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 3:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donnie Thomas. (Carmichael, Brian) Modified on 4/17/2024 to clarify the application is attached to the main PDF (CWL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley, filed by Donnie Thomas. (Carmichael, Brian) Modified on 4/17/2024 to remove 90 day Rule 4m deadline. (CWL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |